Tremblay v. JBS USA
Plaintiff: Ashley Tremblay
Defendant: JBS USA
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2019cv00115
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: James W. Spink, Esq. (hbc)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cody E. Brookhouser-Sisney; and granting #10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron A. Clark. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Motions due by 5/1/2020. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 9/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/26/2019. (esb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Aaron A. Clark, Esq. filed by JBS USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aaron A. Clark, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Cody E. Brookhouser-Sisney filed by JBS USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cody Elyse Brookhouser-Sisney, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by JBS USA.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 8/16/2019. (eh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by JBS USA.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. JBS USA d/b/a Plumrose USA, Inc. answer due 7/30/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JBS USA.(Smith, Jr., Shapleigh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Franklin Unit request original file and certified docket sheet. (law)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by JBS USA. (law)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JBS USA from Vermont Superior Court, Franklin Unit, Civil Division, case number 221-6-19 Frcv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremblay v. JBS USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA
Represented By: Shapleigh Smith, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Cody E. Brookhouser-Sisney, Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Tremblay
Represented By: Shane K. Clark, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: James W. Spink, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?