Lampman v. Roots Property Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Krystal Lampman
Defendant: 644 Depot Street, LLC, Kelly Michaelson, Roots Property Management, LLC and Ari Jackson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00119
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Roots Property Management, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019.(Johnson, Erika)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Kelly Michaelson waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019.(Johnson, Erika)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Ari Jackson waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019.(Johnson, Erika)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: 644 Depot Street, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019.(Johnson, Erika)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 7/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Krystal Lampman. An unsigned affidavit was uploaded at the time of filing. The signed affidavit is now attached to #2 as well as this entry. (jlh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Krystal Lampman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of In Support of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Johnson, Erika) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/25/2019) (jlh).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 644 Depot Street, LLC, Ari Jackson, Kelly Michaelson, Roots Property Management, LLC filed by Krystal Lampman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampman v. Roots Property Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Lampman
Represented By: Erika L. Johnson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 644 Depot Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roots Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?