Howard Center, Inc. v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Howard Center, Inc.
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Walmart Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, CVS Health, Allergan plc, Walmart, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallincrodt, plc, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00191
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 CASE UPDATE: case transferred from Vermont has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46010, filed 11/15/2019. (law)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-119) for MDL No. 2804. Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Schedule)(law)
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Conor B. O'Croinin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/10/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of T. Roe Frazer, II. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/4/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 4, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of T. Roe Frazer, II filed by Howard Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 10/29/2019 in state court) (law)
November 4, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Walmart Inc. served on 10/24/2019. (originally filed 10/29/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Cephalon, Inc. served on 10/16/2019. (originally filed 10/29/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 10/15/2019. (originally filed 10/29/2019 in state court)(esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Johnson & Johnson served on 10/10/2019. (originally filed 10/29/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing of #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (originally filed 10/25/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation served on 10/8/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. served on 10/10/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/10/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service. AmerisourceBergen Corporation served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Endo Health Solutions Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court)(esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Allergan Finance, LLC served on 10/10/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court)(esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Actavis LLC served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court)(esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Mallinckrodt, LLC served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 9/24/2019 in state court)(esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service. CVS Health Corporation served on 10/7/2019. (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. served on 10/7/2019 (esb) (originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number (originally filed 9/25/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan plc, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallincrodt, plc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. filed by Howard Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand) (originally filed 9/24/2019 in state court) (esb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time for All served defendants to Answer until 45 days following either transfer of this action to MDL case in Ohio or this court's resolution of any remand, whichever is later. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/30/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soule, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division (esb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by CVS Health Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (esb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 865-9-19-Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Removal, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard Center, Inc. v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien, Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer E. McDonald, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz, Esq.
Represented By: Alex J. Harris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor, Esq.
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien, Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer E. McDonald, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole, Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallincrodt, plc
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor, Esq.
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole, Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Lax, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole, Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole, Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz, Esq.
Represented By: Alex J. Harris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole, Esq.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy, Esq.
Represented By: Donna Welch, Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Knapp, Esq.
Represented By: Martin L. Roth, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure, Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure, Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Center, Inc.
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II, Esq.
Represented By: E. William Leckerling, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?