Marshall et al v. National Bank of Middlebury
Plaintiff: Bruce R. Marshall and Jeanine Weir
Defendant: National Bank of Middlebury
Case Number: 5:2019cv00246
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Bank of Middlebury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bergman, Elijah)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (esb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Bank of Middlebury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bergman, Elijah)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. The parties stipulated to an extension until February 6, 2020; however, the current response deadline is February 13, 2020. Accordingly, Defendant's response to the Amended complaint is due February 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/28/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir re #7 MOTION for Jury Trial. (esb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #8 Acknowledgement/Acceptance of Service, #9 Notice of Appearance, and #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by National Bank of Middlebury.(Bergman, Elijah) Links added on 1/23/2020 (jlh).
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint filed by National Bank of Middlebury.(Bergman, Elijah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elijah R. Bergman, Esq on behalf of National Bank of Middlebury.(Bergman, Elijah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. National Bank of Middlebury served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020.(Bergman, Elijah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Jury Trial filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (esb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Amended Complaint by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (esb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Bank of Middlebury filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (esb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. National Bank of Middlebury served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (esb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jeanine Weir. (esb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Bruce R. Marshall. (esb)
January 2, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to National Bank of Middlebury. (esb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Bank of Middlebury filed by Bruce R. Marshall, Jeanine Weir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. National Bank of Middlebury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank of Middlebury
Represented By: Elijah R. Bergman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?