Kane-Lee v. Warden of Rikers Island
Petitioner: Patricia Kane-Lee
Respondent: Warden of Rikers Island
Case Number: 5:2020cv00036
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Patricia Kane-Lee. (Attachments: #1 Document No. 5) (eh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/4/2020 to remove duplicate PDF header) (law).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 4/20/2020, Petitioner is ORDERED to Show Cause why the #2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 should not be dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 3/20/2020. (hbc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Southern District of New York; Case Number 1:20-cv-01256.
March 5, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Vermont. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/5/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Patricia Kane-Lee. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Patricia Kane-Lee. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane-Lee v. Warden of Rikers Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Rikers Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Kane-Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?