Patel et al v. University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Plaintiff: Rachel A. Gladstone and Nilay Kamal Patel
Defendant: University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Case Number: 5:2020cv00061
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College re #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #13 Declaration,.(Collins, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of John J. Collins re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Collins, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College (Collins, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College.(Collins, John)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean R. Somermeyer; and granting #7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew B. Murphy. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 6/12/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (law)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(4) the undersigned Magistrate Judge is disqualified and recused from further proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall assigned this civil action to another judicial officer of this Court. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 6/11/2020. (This is a text-only Order.)(law)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew B. Murphy filed by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean R. Somermeyer filed by University of Vermont and State Agricultural College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. University of Vermont and State Agricultural College served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020.(Ice, Ariane)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Collins, Esq on behalf of University of Vermont and State Agricultural College.(Collins, John)
May 19, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to University of Vermont and State Agricultural College.(law)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Lundergan. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 5/4/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Lundergan filed by Rachel A. Gladstone, Nilay Kamal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against University of Vermont and State Agricultural College filed by Nilay Kamal Patel, Rachel A. Gladstone. Waiver issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
Represented By: Sean R. Somermeyer, Esq.
Represented By: John J. Collins, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew B. Murphy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel A. Gladstone
Represented By: Ariane M. Ice, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda L. Lundergan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilay Kamal Patel
Represented By: Ariane M. Ice, Esq.
Represented By: Amanda L. Lundergan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?