Riley v. Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Riley
Defendant: David W. Baker, Beth Carter, Bill Yates, Amy McMullen, Kris Garnjost, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Elizabeth Burrows, Nancy Pedrick and Mount Ascutney School District Board
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 5:2020cv00108
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluator.(Spink, James)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, denying #13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re Count 1 of #4 Complaint, denying #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint, denying #22 MOTION for Hearing on #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Consolidate Hearing with a Trial on the Merits of Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Count. Answer to the first amended complaint is extended to 14 days after issuance of a written decision by the School Board issued pursuant to 16 V.S.A. 243(d). Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 8/13/2020. (esb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2020 re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint, #22 MOTION for Hearing on #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Consolidate Hearing with a Trial on the Merits of Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Count. Plaintiff present with A. Snow, Esq. & W. Meub, Esq. S. Toohey, Esq. present for defendants. Court makes inquiries and counsel make statements. Court makes findings on the record. ORDERED: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is denied. #13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing is denied. #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint is denied. #22 MOTION for Hearing is denied. Counsel for plaintiff is to advise the court of the outcome of the upcoming ENE session and administrative hearing. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl) Text clarified on 8/13/2020 (law).
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint filed by David W. Baker, Elizabeth Burrows, Beth Carter, Kris Garnjost, Amy McMullen, Mount Ascutney School District Board, Nancy Pedrick, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Bill Yates. (Toohey, Sean)
August 7, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by David W. Baker, Elizabeth Burrows, Beth Carter, Kris Garnjost, Amy McMullen, Mount Ascutney School District Board, Nancy Pedrick of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (originally filed 8/3/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing on #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to MOTION to Consolidate Hearing with a Trial on the Merits of Plaintiff's Declaratory Judgment Count filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/31/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION denying #20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.. Signed by Judge Robert P. Gerety, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (originally filed 7/31/2020 in state court) (law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Affidavit of Tiffany Riley) (originally filed 7/30/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Snow, Esq on behalf of Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/30/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/30/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-4 and 6 of #9 First Amended Complaint filed by Mount Ascutney School District Board, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/27/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing re: #13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re Count 1 of #4 Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2020 10:30 AM. (originally filed 7/22/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION re: #13 Motion for Expedited Hearing. The clerk shall schedule a hearing. Signed by Judge Robert P. Gerety, Jr. on 7/14/2020. (originally filed 7/15/2020 in state court) (law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re Count 1 of #4 Complaint filed by Mount Ascutney School District Board, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/27/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re Count 1 of #4 Complaint filed by Tiffany Riley. (originally filed 7/13/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/30/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mount Ascutney School District Board, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/27/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 7/13/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against David W. Baker, Elizabeth Burrows, Beth Carter, Kris Garnjost, Amy McMullen, Mount Ascutney School District Board, Nancy Pedrick, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Bill Yates filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (originally filed 7/17/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY REGARDING MOTION granting #7 Motion to Amend #4 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert P. Gerety, Jr. on 7/14/2020. (originally filed 7/15/2020 in state court) (law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #4 Complaint as a Matter of Course filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (originally filed 7/13/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union served on 6/29/2020. (originally filed 6/29/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Mount Ascutney School District Board served on 6/29/2020. (originally filed 6/29/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Mount Ascutney School District Board, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union filed by Tiffany Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Proposed Summons (Mount Ascutney School District Board), #6 Proposed Summons (Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union)) (originally filed 6/29/2020 in state court)(law)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windsor Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Beth Carter, Kris Garnjost, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Mount Ascutney School District Board, David W. Baker, Elizabeth Burrows, Amy McMullen, Bill Yates, Nancy Pedrick from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windsor Unit, case number 20-cv-251. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Riley
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: William H. Meub, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew J. Snow, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Baker
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Carter
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Yates
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McMullen
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Garnjost
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Burrows
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pedrick
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Ascutney School District Board
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Represented By: Kienan D. Christianson, Esq.
Represented By: Sean Toohey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: James W. Spink, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?