Martel et al v. Condos
Plaintiff: Robert Frenier, Raoul Beaulieu, Brian Smith, Mary Beausoleil and Tracey Martel
Defendant: James Condos
Case Number: 5:2020cv00131
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGMENT - The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigant (appeal period expires 10/16/2020)) (esb)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/16/2020. (esb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2020 re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and REQUEST for Expedited Hearing. D. Bucknam, Esq., H. Dhillon, Esq., D. Warrington, Esq., M. Meuser, Esq. present for plaintiffs. D. Groff, AAG, P. Back, AAG present for defendant. All counsel present by video/telephone conference. Court makes inquiries and counsel make statements. ORDERED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is taken under advisement and REQUEST for Expedited Hearing is granted. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Warrington; granting #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Meuser; granting #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harmeet K. Dhillon. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/14/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 EXPERT DECLARATION of Scott E. Gessler re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REQUEST for Expedited Hearing by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Bucknam, Deborah)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Condos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Senning)(Groff, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Condos. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Order)(Back, Philip) . Text clarified on 9/14/2020 (jlh).
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harmeet K. Dhillon filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harmeet K. Dhillon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(law)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Meuser filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark P. Meuser, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(law)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Warrington filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David A. Warrington, #2 Application for Attorney Admission, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing by videoconference set for 9/15/2020 at 2:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Groff, Esq on behalf of James Condos.(Groff, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip A. Back, Esq on behalf of James Condos.(Back, Philip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: James Condos waiver sent on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020.(Bucknam, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, REQUEST for Expedited Hearing filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order) (esb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against James Condos filed by Tracey Martel, Robert Frenier, Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Brian Smith. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martel et al v. Condos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Frenier
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Warrington, Esq.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Beaulieu
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Warrington, Esq.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Warrington, Esq.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beausoleil
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Warrington, Esq.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Martel
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: Mark P. Meuser, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Warrington, Esq.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Condos
Represented By: Philip A. Back, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Groff, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?