Valente et al v. French et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Valente, Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Michael Valente, Paul Gallo and Ingrid Gallo
Defendant: William Mathis, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Jennifer Deck Samuelson, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Lauren Fierman, Peter Peltz, Christopher Sell, Kathy Lavoie, Angelita Pena, Oliver Olsen, Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Jenna O'Farrell, Kim Gleason, David Baker and Two Rivers Supervisory Union
Case Number: 5:2020cv00135
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Ingrid Gallo, Paul Gallo, Michael Valente, Nancy Valente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Valente Renewed Request for Tuition Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gallo Renewed Request for Tuition Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Buckley Renewed Request for Tuition Letter)(Keller, Timothy)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER withdrawing #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, granting #49 MOTION to Vacate 11/5/2020 Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/30/2020. (esb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 49 WITHDRAWAL of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Vacate 11/5/2020 Hearing Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Ingrid Gallo, Paul Gallo, Michael Valente, Nancy Valente (Keller, Timothy) Motion to vacate added on 10/30/2020 (jlh) Link corrected on 11/2/2020 (jlh).
October 19, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Christopher Sell, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Lauren Fierman, David Baker, Two Rivers Supervisory Union. Exhibits A, B and C were not uploaded at the time of filing. They are now attached to #44 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C) (law)
October 19, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL/CORRECTION: Document 46 has been removed and is now attached as Memorandum in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union, Christopher Sell, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Lauren Fierman, David Baker, Two Rivers Supervisory Union. It is attached to this entry as well. (law)
October 16, 2020 Filing 46 Entry removed from the docket.
October 16, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Baker, Lauren Fierman, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Christopher Sell, Two Rivers Supervisory Union, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ellis, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Baker, Lauren Fierman, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Christopher Sell, Two Rivers Supervisory Union, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union.(Ellis, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2020: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (law).
October 16, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State Defendants filed by Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel French, #2 Declaration of Brad James, #3 Declaration of John Carroll, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Alexander, Jon)
October 16, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim of State Defendants filed by Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson.(Alexander, Jon) Text clarified on 10/19/2020 (law).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David G. Hodges. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/28/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David G. Hodges filed by Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Ingrid Gallo, Paul Gallo, Michael Valente, Nancy Valente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David G. Hodges, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 25, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #26 , #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 , #35 , #36 Summons Returned Executed. The documents were uploaded without page 1. The corrected documents are now attached to the entries as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Document 27, #2 Document 28, #3 Document 29, #4 Document 30, #5 Document 31, #6 Document 32, #7 Document 33, #8 Document 34, #9 Document 35, #10 Document 36) (jlh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing by video conference set for 11/5/2020 at 1:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William F. Ellis on behalf of David Baker, Lauren Fierman, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Christopher Sell, Two Rivers Supervisory Union, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, William)
September 23, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. William Mathis served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 36 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Sabina Brochu served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 35 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Peter Peltz served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 34 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Oliver Olsen served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 33 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kim Gleason served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 32 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kathy Lavoie served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 31 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. John Carroll served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 30 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jennifer Deck Samuelson served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 29 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jenna O'Farrell served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 28 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Daniel French served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 27 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Angelita Pena served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/16/2020.(Keller, Timothy) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/25/2020) (jlh).
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel E. Smith, Esq on behalf of Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson.(Smith, Rachel)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - time extended to 10/16/20, and STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants answers due 10/16/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/18/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson.(Alexander, Jon)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon T. Alexander, Esq on behalf of Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson.(Alexander, Jon)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. William Mathis served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Two Rivers Supervisory Union served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Sabina Brochu served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Peter Peltz served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Oliver Olsen served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Lauren Fierman served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kim Gleason served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kathy Lavoie served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. John Carroll served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jennifer Deck Samuelson served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jenna O'Farrell served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Greater Rutland Supervisory Union served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. David Baker served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Daniel French served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Christopher Sell served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Angelita Pena served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020.(Keller, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Keller. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/9/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Keller filed by Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Ingrid Gallo, Paul Gallo, Michael Valente, Nancy Valente. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy D. Keller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 ***Voluntarily Withdrawn, See Doc #49 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joanna Buckley, Stephen Buckley, Ingrid Gallo, Paul Gallo, Michael Valente, Nancy Valente. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(esb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/30/2020) (jlh).
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Baker, Sabina Brochu, John Carroll, Lauren Fierman, Daniel French, Kim Gleason, Greater Rutland Supervisory Union, Kathy Lavoie, William Mathis, Jenna O'Farrell, Oliver Olsen, Peter Peltz, Angelita Pena, Jennifer Deck Samuelson, Christopher Sell, Two Rivers Supervisory Union, Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union filed by Ingrid Gallo, Stephen Buckley, Michael Valente, Joanna Buckley, Nancy Valente, Paul Gallo. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valente et al v. French et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mathis
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Rutland Supervisory Union
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Deck Samuelson
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Southeast Supervisory Union
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Fierman
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Peltz
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sell
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lavoie
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelita Pena
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Olsen
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabina Brochu
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carroll
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel French
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna O'Farrell
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Gleason
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baker
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Rivers Supervisory Union
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Valente
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Buckley
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Buckley
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Valente
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gallo
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Gallo
Represented By: Timothy D. Keller, Esq.
Represented By: Deborah T. Bucknam, Esq.
Represented By: David G. Hodges, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?