Young v. Donovan
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: T.J. Donovan
Case Number: 5:2020cv00175
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT - This case is DISMISSED without prejudice on the court's own motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 1/4/2021))(esb)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/1/2020. (esb) Text clarified on 12/29/2020 (jlh).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for Email Filing and Notification; denying #4 Motion for Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 of Fed. R. Civ. P.. Plaintiff shall submit either an amended and complete application to proceed informa pauperis or otherwise pay the requisite filing fee by 11/23/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/9/2020. (esb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 of Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (esb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Email Filing and Notification filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (esb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Huguette Nicole Young. (esb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Huguette Nicole Young, Ph.D., #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?