Russell v. Scott
Plaintiff: Justin Russell
Defendant: Jason Scott
Case Number: 5:2020cv00184
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Scott.(McLean, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. McLean, Esq on behalf of Jason Scott.(McLean, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jason Scott served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020.(Bond, David) Party served corrected on 12/15/2020 (jlh).
November 10, 2020 CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford and referred to Judge John M. Conroy due to case assignment error. Plaintiff's counsel shall disregard LR 73 Forms issued. (law)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Scott filed by Justin Russell.Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Russell
Represented By: David E. Bond, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Scott
Represented By: David R. McLean, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?