Thompson et al v. Vermont Department of Children and Families
Plaintiff: Chester Thompson and Rebekah Thompson
Defendant: Vermont Department of Children and Families
Case Number: 5:2020cv00192
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Rebekah Thompson, Chester Thompson. Docket text has been clarified to read: Vermont Department of Children and Families waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (jlh)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Vermont Department of Children and Families waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Tao, Shawn) Date of service and answer due dates corrected on 1/11/2021 (jlh).
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document #4 has been removed from the docket as being filed in error. (jlh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Entry has been removed from the docket.
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Vermont Department of Children and Families filed by Rebekah Thompson, Chester Thompson. (pjl)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/18/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Chester Thompson, Rebekah Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chester Thompson, #2 Affidavit of Rebekah Thompson, #3 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Vermont Department of Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Thompson
Represented By: Shawn T. Tao, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Thompson
Represented By: Shawn T. Tao, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?