Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andrew Randy Santiago
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00018
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Andrew Randy Santiago. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Tracking Confirmations)(Anderson, Arthur)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hugh Dun Rappaport, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Dun Rappaport, Hugh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Andrew Randy Santiago. Summonses issued. (esb)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/27/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Andrew Randy Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Randy Santiago, #2 Affidavit of Net Worth, #3 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Hugh Dun Rappaport, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Randy Santiago
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?