Pieciak v. Crowe LLP
Plaintiff: Michael S. Pieciak
Defendant: Crowe LLP
Case Number: 5:2021cv00273
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Schedule filed by Michael S. Pieciak.(Rood, Jennifer)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crowe LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caesar A. Tabet, John M. Fitzgerald, Jordan E. Wilkow, and Jonathan S. Kim. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/9/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caesar A. Tabet, John M. Fitzgerald, Jordan E. Wilkow, and Jonathan S. Kim filed by Crowe LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of #1 Notice of Removal by Crowe LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 11/22/2021 in state court) (esm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Crowe LLP filed by Michael S. Pieciak. (originally filed 10/26/2021 in state court) (esm)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer; Crowe LLP answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/30/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Crowe LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division. (esm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Crowe LLP (esm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crowe LLP from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number 21-CV-0335. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (esm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pieciak v. Crowe LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Pieciak
Represented By: Jennifer Rood, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowe LLP
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Represented By: Caesar A. Tabet, Esq.
Represented By: John M. Fitzgerald, Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan S. Kim, Esq.
Represented By: Jordan E. Wilkow, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?