Edward R. Mena, Sr. v. Frito Lay and XYZ

Plaintiff: Edward R. Mena, Sr.
Defendant: Frito Lay and XYZ
Case Number: 1:2018cv00051
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Virgin Islands District Court
0 Judge: George W Cannon
1 Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss of PepsiCo Caribbean, Inc. filed by Defendant Frito Lay. (Christian, Adam)
December 6, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss of PepsiCo Caribbean, Inc. by Defendant Frito Lay. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Christian with Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Abimael Perez) (Christian, Adam)
November 21, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER (GWC) dated 11/21/2018 UPON CONSIDERATION of #6 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that the said motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendant Frito Lay shall have up to and including December 5, 2018, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
November 21, 2018 6 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Frito Lay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Christian, Adam)
November 1, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER (GWC) dated 11/1/2018 UPON CONSIDERATION of #4 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that the said motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendant Frito Lay shall have up to and including November 21, 2018, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 31, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Frito Lay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Christian, Adam)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER (GWC) dated 10/11/2018 granting Defendant's #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint answer due 10/31/2018. (JEF)
October 11, 2018 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Frito Lay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Christian, Adam)
October 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Frito Lay from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number SX-17-CV-52. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-748489)filed by Frito Lay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Christian, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward R. Mena, Sr. v. Frito Lay and XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito Lay
Represented By: Adam G. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Mena, Sr.
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel-Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?