United States of America (Rural Development) v. Soto et al
Plaintiff: United States of America (Rural Development)
Defendant: Juan C. Soto Sr. and Luz E. Soto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00038
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America (Rural Development). Juan C. Soto Sr. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Rural Development) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America (Rural Development). Luz E. Soto waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Action for Debt and Foreclosure of Mortgage) against All Defendants filed by United States of America (Rural Development). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D- Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E- Reamortization Agreement, #6 Exhibit F- Demand Letters, #7 Exhibit G- COI & Payoff Information, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tyson-Floyd, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (Rural Development) v. Soto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C. Soto Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz E. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (Rural Development)
Represented By: Angela Tyson-Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?