GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. et al v. SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. and HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.
Defendant: SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Stuart Sobel(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-808519) filed by Counter Claimants SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL, SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL, Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Mirocha, Nathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Barry Michael Clark(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-808525) filed by Counter Claimants SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL, SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL, Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Mirocha, Nathan)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/3/2019 Initial Disclosures by 10/24/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/15/2019., Initial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 , #10 Counterclaim, ANSWER to #11 , #10 Counterclaim by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. (Messier, Chad)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re for GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E... (Messier, Chad)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global SE, Corporate Parent Hannover Re for GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E... (Messier, Chad)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global SE, Corporate Parent Hannover Re for HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E... (Messier, Chad)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re for GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E... (Messier, Chad)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Sanders on behalf of Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. (Sanders, Daniel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Sunshine Shopping Center, Inc's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5) (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY E-signature is needed please re-file Re: #10 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,. (KAB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Sunshine Shopping Center, Inc's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E., Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London by SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 1, #2 Exhibit part 2, #3 Exhibit part 3, #4 Exhibit part 4, #5 Exhibit part 5) (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/12/2019 granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (KMD)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Daniel G. Sanders(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-808587) by Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Daniel G. Sanders, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. All Defendants. (Perrell, Charlotte)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Barry Michael Clark(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-808525) by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Stuart Sobel(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-808519) by Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mirocha, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Mirocha on behalf of Defendant SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL (Mirocha, Nathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad C. Messier on behalf of Plaintiffs GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E. (Messier, Chad)
August 19, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued to plaintiff(Great Lakes Insurance S.E. and HDI Global Specialty S.E. with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (AM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL to Hatim Yusf, Resident Agent (AM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-804939.)filed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Perrell, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E. et al v. SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE S.E.
Represented By: Charlotte K Perrell
Represented By: Chad C. Messier
Represented By: Daniel G. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY S.E.
Represented By: Charlotte K Perrell
Represented By: Chad C. Messier
Represented By: Daniel G. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNSHINE SHOPPING CENTER, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE MALL
Represented By: Nathan Mirocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?