Josephine Boddie v. Selene Wambeke
Plaintiff: Josephine Boddie
Defendant: Selene Wambeke
Case Number: 1:2019cv00043
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shoup, Emily)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Selene Wambeke (Shoup, Emily)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/7/2019 Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2019., Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Selene Wambeke. (Shoup, Emily)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Selene Wambeke from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, Division of St. Croix, case number 19-cv-377. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-809701)filed by Selene Wambeke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Summons) (Shoup, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josephine Boddie v. Selene Wambeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Wambeke
Represented By: Emily A. Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Boddie
Represented By: Diane M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?