Ivery v. C-Boy, Inc. d/b/a Caribbean Steakhouse & Saloon
Plaintiff: Mrs. Carmelite S. Ivery
Defendant: C-Boy, Inc. d/b/a Caribbean Steakhouse & Saloon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00050
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Intradistrict Transfer to St. Thomas/St. John Division case number civil 19-97. as per Order #3 (TNS)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/8/2019 granting #2 Motion Requesting Removal (KMD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Requesting Removal by Plaintiff Carmelite S. Ivery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Greene, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Carmelite S. Ivery against C-Boy, Inc. d/b/a Caribbean Steakhouse & Saloon ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-812542.)filed by Carmelite S. Ivery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivery v. C-Boy, Inc. d/b/a Caribbean Steakhouse & Saloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Boy, Inc. d/b/a Caribbean Steakhouse & Saloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Carmelite S. Ivery
Represented By: Ryan W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?