Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor v. SRS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor
Defendant: SRS, Inc. and Charles Pickett
Case Number: 1:2020cv00031
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (GWC) dated 9/9/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of the parties' #6 Stipulation, it is now hereby ORDERED that the stipulation is ACCEPTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including November 2, 2020, within which to file an answer(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Ma, Frances)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses and Complaint served on Adriane Dudley and Darrell Gay on behalf of all defendants on 9/9/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Ma, Frances)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SRS, Inc.. (TNS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Pickett. (TNS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SRS, Inc. Summons, #3 Charles Pickett Summons) # 4 [Exhibit A] (Ma, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor v. SRS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Frances Yung Ho Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?