Russell et al v. FirstBank Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Royette V. Russell and Ronald E Russell
Defendant: FirstBank, Virgin Islands, Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and FirstBank Puerto Rico
Case Number: 1:2020cv00077
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Notice of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Ronald E Russell, Royette V. Russell (Cameron, K. Glenda)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Trans Union LLCs Initial Disclosures by Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. (Mitchell, Sofia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Firstbank Puerto Rico's Rule 26(a) Disclosures by FirstBank Puerto Rico (Cole, Warren)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/26/2020 Initial disclosures due by 11/16/2020., Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/15/2020., Initial Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FirstBank Puerto Rico. (Cole, Warren)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Mitchell, Sofia)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/9/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of #9 FirstBank's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that FirstBank Puerto Rico shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before October 23, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant FirstBank Puerto Rico. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cole, Warren)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (GWC) dated 10/9/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of #6 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, it is now hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Trans Union shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before October 22, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal by Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Mitchell, Sofia)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Mitchell, Sofia)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc... (Mitchell, Sofia)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sofia L Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. (Mitchell, Sofia)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 71 by FirstBank Puerto Rico (Cole, Warren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren B Cole on behalf of Defendant FirstBank Puerto Rico (Cole, Warren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant FirstBank Puerto Rico from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number SX-20-CV-00658. filed by FirstBank Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Cole, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. FirstBank Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Royette V. Russell
Represented By: K. Glenda Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E Russell
Represented By: K. Glenda Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstBank, Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sofia L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstBank Puerto Rico
Represented By: Warren B Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?