Hollister v. St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert D. Hollister
Defendant: St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00246
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/21/2021 sustaining #8 Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint; striking #6 First Amended Complaint (KMD)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.. (Morgan, Micol)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint by Defendant St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morgan, Micol)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #6 Amended Complaint Filing and Service by Nathan Mirocha for Plaintiff Robert D. Hollister (Mirocha, Nathan)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.filed by Robert D. Hollister. (Mirocha, Nathan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.. (Morgan, Micol)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (GWC) dated 6/9/2021 UPON CONSIDERATION of Defendant's #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is now hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension of time up to and including June 16, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morgan, Micol)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Micol)
June 3, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Filer is advised to file a civil cover sheet pursuant to LCRi 3.1. When filing the civil cover sheet use the event Notice of Filing with the civil cover sheet as an attachment to the notice and to link the document to the complaint. Re: #1 Notice of Removal,. (W, K)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc. from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number SX-2021-CV-00389. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-938705)filed by St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint) (Morgan, Micol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollister v. St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Hollister
Represented By: Nathan Mirocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. George Village Botanical Garden of St. Croix, Inc.
Represented By: Micol L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?