Canaii, Jr. v. Government of the Virgin Islands , Albert Bryan et al
Plaintiff: Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.
Defendant: Attorney General, Denise N. George, Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector III, Ryan O. Rawlins, Sr., Government of the Virgin Islands, Aldelbert Bryan, Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector II, George L. Otto, Director of the Virgin Islands Fire Service, Daryl A. George Sr. and Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands
Case Number: 1:2021cv00256
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (GWC) dated 8/12/2021 denying #24 Motion for Entry of Default (GPG)
August 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Chapman, Zuleyma)
August 9, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chapman, Zuleyma)
August 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: the document name and event does not match. Filer is advised to refile. Re: #23 Response. (W, K)
August 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (TNS)
August 4, 2021 Filing 23 Response re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (TNS)
July 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE Filing Proposed Order by Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Chapman, Zuleyma)
July 30, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: A proposed order was not filed as an attachment to the motion. Filer is advised to file a proposed order using the event Notice (Other) referencing Notice of Filing as the docket text. The propose order will be an attachment to the notice and the document should be linked to the motion.Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (W, K)
July 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE Corrected Exhibit A by Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA Ex A) (Chapman, Zuleyma)
July 28, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA Ex A, #2 Exhibit VIFS Ex B, #3 Exhibit DOP Ex C, #4 Exhibit EEOC Ex D) (Chapman, Zuleyma)
July 23, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr. on Denise N. George. (TNS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. on Albert Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (TNS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. on Deputy Inspector Ryan Rawlins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (TNS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. on Daryl A. George. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (TNS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed on George Otto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (TNS)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. Director of the Virgin Islands Fire Service, Daryl A. George Sr. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (AM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr. Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector III, Ryan O. Rawlins, Sr. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (AM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr. Albert Bryan Jr. through Claudia Charles Government of the Virgin Islands served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (AM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr. Attorney General, Denise N. George through Roberta Cazaubon served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (AM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector II, George L. Otto served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (AM)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re: #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (TNS)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (GWC) dated 6/16/2021 granting Plaintiff Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.'s #6 Motion for Permission to Use Electronic Case Filing. (ABO)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION For Permission to use Electronic Case Filing by Plaintiff Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector III, Ryan O. Rawlins, Sr.. (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector II, George L. Otto. (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Attorney General, Denise N. George. (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Director of the Virgin Islands Fire Service, Daryl A. George Sr.. (TNS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.)Paid filed by Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.. Receipt # 100007841. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canaii, Jr. v. Government of the Virgin Islands , Albert Bryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General, Denise N. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector III, Ryan O. Rawlins, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of the Virgin Islands, Aldelbert Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Islands Fire Service Deputy Inspector II, George L. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the Virgin Islands Fire Service, Daryl A. George Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bryan Jr. Government of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Zuleyma Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur B. Canaii, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?