Rodriguez- Simmiolkjier v. U.S. Government et al
Plaintiff: Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez
Defendant: U.S. Government, American Airlines Group, Inc. and American Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00257
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: George W Cannon
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against American Airlines Group, Inc.filed by Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez. (Rohn, Lee)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/16/2021 accepting and granting #10 Stipulation to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff Desni M. Rodriguez-Simmiolkjier shall filed herewith the First Amended Complaint. (ABO)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Stipulation to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Rohn, Lee)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (GWC) dated 7/9/2021 accepting and granting Defendant American Airlines Group, Inc.'s #8 Notice of Negotiated Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ABO)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Negotiated Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Airlines Group, Inc. (Anaclerio, Claire)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Anaclerio on behalf of Defendant American Airlines Group, Inc. (Anaclerio, Claire)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad C. Messier on behalf of Defendant American Airlines Group, Inc. (Messier, Chad)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez. American Airlines Group, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rohn, Lee)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CT Corporation System, as registered agent for American Airlines Group, Inc.. (TNS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Government as representative of the Transportation Security Administration. (TNS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines Group, Inc., U.S. Government ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-941002.)filed by Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons) (Rohn, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez- Simmiolkjier v. U.S. Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Chad C. Messier
Represented By: Claire Anaclerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desni M Simmiolkjier-Rodriguez
Represented By: Lee J Rohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?