Francis v. People of the Virgin Islands et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Francis
Defendant: People of the Virgin Islands and Clerk, District Court Of The Virgin Islands
Case Number: 1:2023cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cecil Francis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) In Re: #2 ORDER (TNS)
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL return receipt Re: #3 Hard Copy Notice of filing (JB)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 HARD COPY NOTICE of filing Related Document: #2 sent via Certified Mail Return Receipt. (JC)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (EAH) dated 2/1/2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with a Civil Cover Sheet, an IFP application, and a copy of this Order. (GMF)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.) not paid, No IFP motion filed by Cecil Francis with complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 attachment 1, #3 attachment 2, #4 attachment 3) (TNS) Modified on 2/1/2023 (TNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. People of the Virgin Islands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk, District Court Of The Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?