Altisource Asset Management Corporation v. Redleaf
Plaintiff: Altisource Asset Management Corporation
Defendant: Nathaniel Redleaf
Case Number: 1:2023cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Amy Rice on behalf of Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation (Rice, Michelle)
February 28, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Rappaport, Douglas)
February 28, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rappaport, Douglas)
February 23, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altisource Asset Management Corporation. (Kaplan, Howard)
February 23, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #23 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation is required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (IW)
February 21, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Jay Kaplan on behalf of Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation (Kaplan, Howard)
February 1, 2023 Filing 22 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) Related Document: #14 for Howard J. Kaplan, Esquire. (TNS)
January 25, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Rosen on behalf of Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf (Rosen, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Yecies on behalf of Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf (Yecies, Jacqueline)
January 25, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Rappaport on behalf of Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf (Rappaport, Douglas)
January 24, 2023 Filing 18 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) for Douglas A. Rappaport, Esquire Related Document: #12 (TNS)
January 24, 2023 Filing 17 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) for Michelle A. Rice,Esquire, Related Document: #14 (TNS) .
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) Related Document: #10 for Jacqueline Yecies, esquire. (TNS)
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 OATH OF ADMISSION (EAH) for Elizabeth C. Rosen, Esquire Related Document: #11 (TNS)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/18/2023 granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Rice). (GMF)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/18/2023 granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Kaplan). (GMF)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/18/2023 granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Rappaport). (GMF)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/18/2023 granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Rosen). (GMF)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/18/2023 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Yecies). (GMF)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EAH) dated 1/13/2023 granting #8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response is due on or before February 28, 2023. (RDB)
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Doc. #1-2, Complaint by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
January 11, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Michelle A. Rice(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044430) by Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Applicant's Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sponsor's Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Applicant's Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rhea, Gordon)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Howard J. Kaplan(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1044427) by Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sponsor's Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Applicant's Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rhea, Gordon)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Douglas A Rappaport, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1043397) by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Elizabeth C. Rosen, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1043396) by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jacqueline Yecies, Esq.(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1043392) by Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl)
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant Nathaniel Redleaf (Beckstedt, Carl)
January 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Altisource Asset Management Corporation from SUPERIOR COURT, DISTRICT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, case number SX-2022-CV-00497. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1043154)filed by Nathaniel Redleaf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altisource Asset Management Corporation v. Redleaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altisource Asset Management Corporation
Represented By: Gordon C Rhea
Represented By: Howard Jay Kaplan
Represented By: Michelle Amy Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Redleaf
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Douglas A. Rappaport
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Rosen
Represented By: Jacqueline Yecies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?