Fox v. Mutidi
Plaintiff: Patrick Fox
Defendant: Aishah Mutidi
Case Number: 1:2023cv00003
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fischer, John)
February 28, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III. (TNS)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (EAH) dated 2/27/2023 granting #10 Motion to Continue. (GMF)
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Patrick Fox. (Fischer, John)
February 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service (Plf's Rule 26 Disclosures) by Patrick Fox (Fischer, John)
February 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Initial Conference by Plaintiff Patrick Fox. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fischer, John)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Aishah Mutidi. (D'Amour, Kevin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service by Aishah Mutidi Re: Initial Disclosures (D'Amour, Kevin)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CONFERENCE (EAH) dated 2/13/2023, (Initial Conference set for 3/27/2023 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III.) (GMF)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aishah Mutidi. (D'Amour, Kevin)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F. D'Amour on behalf of Defendant Aishah Mutidi (D'Amour, Kevin)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Fox. Aishah Mutidi served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Fischer, John)
January 17, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aishah Mutidi. (TNS)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aishah Mutidi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1044842.)filed by Patrick Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Fischer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Mutidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Fox
Represented By: John P. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aishah Mutidi
Represented By: Kevin F. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?