D'Iorio v. McClafferty et al
Plaintiff: Anthony J D'Iorio
Defendant: Mac Private Equity, Inc., MPE Clearing & Holdings, Inc. and Brett. Matthew McClafferty
Case Number: 1:2024cv00040
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2024 Filing 8 Intradistrict Transfer to St. Thomas, St. John Division case number 3:24-cv-064. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the District Court of the Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas and St. John for all further proceedings. (TNS)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EAH) dated 12/11/2024 GRANTING #6 Amended Motion for Change of Venue, and finding as moot #5 Motion to Change Venue. (RDB)
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Anthony J D'Iorio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rames, Kevin)
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue to the Division of St. Thomas & St. John by Plaintiff Anthony J D'Iorio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rames, Kevin)
December 10, 2024 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #5 MOTION to Change Venue to the Division of St. Thomas & St. John. Incorrect case number. (TSJ)
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #2 Notice (Other),. Incorrect case number and court division listed.
December 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet by Anthony J D'Iorio re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rames, Kevin)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Summonses by Anthony J D'Iorio re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Mac Private Equity, Inc., #2 Exhibit Summons to Brett Matthew McClafferty, #3 Exhibit Summons to MPE Clearing & Holdings, Inc.) (Rames, Kevin)
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVIDC-1183856.)filed by Anthony J D'Iorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List with Exhibits) (Rames, Kevin)
December 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #1 Complaint. No Civil Cover sheet filed. Filer is advised to file a civil cover sheet pursuant to LCRi 3.1. When filing the civil cover sheet use the event Notice of Filing with the civil cover sheet as an attachment to the notice and to link the document to the complaint. (TSJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Iorio v. McClafferty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Private Equity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPE Clearing & Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett. Matthew McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J D'Iorio
Represented By: Kevin A Rames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?