EJP, LLC v. Banco Popular De Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: EJP, LLC
Defendant: Banco Popular De Puerto Rico
Case Number: 1:2025cv00013
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Emile A Henderson
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declarato
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Filing 16 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. (Komives, Lisa)
April 9, 2025 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY:The document title and event do not match. Filer is advised to refile using the correct event. Re: #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Opposition. (KW)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (EAH) dated 04/08/2025. Mediation shall be completed no later than May 23, 2025. (BMS)
April 8, 2025 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/2025. (Court Reporter FTR.) (JC)
April 8, 2025 Filing 13 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff EJP, LLC. (Manning, Yohana)
April 7, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Opposition by Plaintiff EJP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EJP0001 - EJP00046, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Abraham, Atiim)
April 3, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by EJP, LLC (Abraham, Atiim)
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (WAL) dated 04/02/2025. UPON CONSIDERATION of Plaintiff EJP, LCC's #5 "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings," filed March 24, 2025, and #9 "Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opposition," filed April 1, 2025, wherein Plaintiff requests an aggregate extension of time beyond its March 31, 2025 deadline to April 7, 2025 within which to respond to Defendant Banco Popular de Puerto Rico's #4 "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings" due to Plaintiffs counsel's personal family matters, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's #5 "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings" is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's #9 "Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opposition" is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 7, 2025 within which to file its response to Defendant's #4 "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings." (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (EDW)
April 2, 2025 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY A proposed order was not filed as an attachment to the motion pursuant to LRCi 7.1(e). Filer is advised to file a proposed order using the event Notice (Other) referencing Notice of Filing as the docket text. The proposed order will be an attachment to the notice and the document should be linked to the motion. Re: #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend . (JC)
April 1, 2025 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Plaintiff EJP, LLC. (Abraham, Atiim)
April 1, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Atiim Dia Abraham on behalf of Plaintiff EJP, LLC (Abraham, Atiim)
April 1, 2025 Filing 7 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. (Komives, Lisa)
April 1, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Banco Popular's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Banco Popular De Puerto Rico (Komives, Lisa)
March 24, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff EJP, LLC. (Manning, Yohana)
March 10, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Real Estate Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Komives, Lisa)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (EAH) dated 02/25/2025 setting Initial Conference for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III, and setting other deadlines. (BMS)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. (Komives, Lisa)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Banco Popular De Puerto Rico from Superior Court, case number SX-2025-cv-00009. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BVIDC-1195997)filed by Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal - Superior Court) (Komives, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EJP, LLC v. Banco Popular De Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EJP, LLC
Represented By: Atiim Dia Abraham
Represented By: Yohana M Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular De Puerto Rico
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Komives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?