Heirs et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Johanna Heirs, Lorentzine Heirs, Hodge, Harold A. Thomas, Arimenta Heirs Zystema, Verl E. Thomas, patricia smith, America Hodge Smith, Mary Magdelene Heirs, Christian Heirs, John von Beverhout Heirs, Mansur Muwakkil, Florence Heirs, Roberts Heirs, Meyers, Ida Smith, Inez Heirs Matthias, Osborne Hodge, Eleanor Sullivan, Herman Heirs Zystema, Ademola Olugebefola, James Henry Heirs and Jacob Heirs
Defendant: National Park Service et. al., U.S. Department of the Interior and Ryan K. Zinke
Case Number: 3:2018cv00063
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants U.S. Department of the Interior, Ryan K. Zinke. (Hewlett, Joycelyn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants U.S. Department of the Interior, Ryan K. Zinke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hewlett, Joycelyn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants U.S. Department of the Interior, Ryan K. Zinke. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Hewlett, Joycelyn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TRH)
August 23, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of the Virgin Islands. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: In the interest of justice, the Clerk of Court is accordingly directed to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for the District of the Virgin Islands. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a),(c). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/23/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ne) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF ELEANOR SULLIVAN TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT FILED UNDER FEDERAL LAW 42:1983 AGAINST THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR BY AFFIANT, PATENT HOLDER THAT VENUE IN THIS ARTICLE III COURT IS ACCURATE AND SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO AN ARTICLE IV COURT, DISTRICT COURT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, re: #4 Order. Document filed by Eleanor Sullivan. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF, OSBORNE A. HODGE JR., TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT 18-6548 FILED UNDER FEDERAL LAW 42:1983 AGAINST RYAN K. ZINKE IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, JURISDICTION & VENUE IN THIS ARTICLE III COURT IS ACCURATE AND SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO AN ARTICLE IV COURT, DISTRICT COURT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS, re: #4 Order,. Document filed by Osborne Hodge. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Smith TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT FILED UNDER FEDERAL LAW 42:1983 AGAINST THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR BY AFFIANT, PATENT HOLDER THAT VENUE IN THIS ARTICLE III COURT IS ACCURATE AND SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO AN ARTICLE IV COURT, DISTRICT COURT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS. Document filed by Patricia Smith. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Harold Alexander Thomas, III. Document filed by Harold A. Thomas. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Ida Smith IN SUPPORT. Document filed by Ida Smith. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIRMATION of Verl E. Thomas IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT AGAINST RYAN K. ZINKE IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR. Document filed by Verl E. Thomas. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIRMATION OF PLAINTIFF, AMERICA SMITH, FOR HER COMPLAINT AGAINST RYAN K. ZINKE, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR. Document filed by America Hodge Smith. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. National Park Service et. al. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; U.S. Department of the Interior served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Ryan K. Zinke served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Herman Heirs Zystema; Mary Magdelene Heirs; Christian Heirs; Roberts Heirs; Lorentzine Heirs; Jacob Heirs; Florence Heirs; Johanna Heirs; Arimenta Heirs Zystema; John von Beverhout Heirs; James Henry Heirs. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause on or before August 22, 2018, why this action should not be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of the Virgin Islands. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/01/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JEFF SESSIONS AND U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Park Service et. al.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan K. Zinke. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Park Service et. al., U.S. Department of the Interior, Ryan K. Zinke. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401214284)Document filed by Herman Heirs Zystema, Mansur Muwakkil, Mary Magdelene Heirs, National Park Service et. al., Verl E. Thomas, Christian Heirs, Ademola Olugebefola, Roberts Heirs, Harold A. Thomas, Eleanor Sullivan, Ida Smith, Lorentzine Heirs, Jacob Heirs, Florence Heirs, Johanna Heirs, Arimenta Heirs Zystema, Patricia Smith, John von Beverhout Heirs, Osborne Hodge, James Henry Heirs, Hodge, America Hodge Smith, Meyers, Inez Heirs Matthias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 Part 1, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 Part 2, #11 Exhibit Ex 10)(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF, MANSUR MUWAKKIL TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT FILED UNDER FEDERAL LAW 42:1983 AGAINST THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR BY AFFIANT, PATENT HOLDER THAT VENUE IN THIS ARTICLE III COURT IS ACCURATE AND SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO AN ARTICLE IV COURT, DISTRICT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS; re: #4 Order. Document filed by Mansur Muwakkil. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heirs et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorentzine Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arimenta Heirs Zystema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verl E. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: patricia smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America Hodge Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Magdelene Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John von Beverhout Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansur Muwakkil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberts Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Heirs Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborne Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Heirs Zystema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ademola Olugebefola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Henry Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Joycelyn Hewlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan K. Zinke
Represented By: Joycelyn Hewlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?