Crown Bay Marina, L.P. et al vs Jeffrey Epstein & Michelle Transportation et.al
Plaintiff: Crown Bay Marina, L.P.
Defendant: Big N Barge and Jeffrey Epstein & Michelle's Transportation Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00069
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crown Bay Marina, L.P. re #5 Notice of Appearance (Cattie, David)
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #5 Notice of Appearance. Certificate of Service signature line is incorrect. Please refile Certificate of Service only. If filing assistance is required, please contact the Clerk's Office. (MA)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cattie on behalf of Plaintiff Crown Bay Marina, L.P. (Cattie, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Crown Bay Marina, L.P.. (Cattie, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons issued (KAB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Epstein & Michelle's Transportation Company, LLC. (KAB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-741922.)filed by Crown Bay Marina, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Duensing, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Bay Marina, L.P. et al vs Jeffrey Epstein & Michelle Transportation et.al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Bay Marina, L.P.
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Represented By: David J. Cattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big N Barge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Epstein & Michelle's Transportation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?