Tyler Batten v. Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Batten
Defendant: Gigacrete, Inc., Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC, Phillip Smith and Roger Minkoff
Case Number: 3:2018cv00082
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM) granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers due November 15, 2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Roger Minkoff. (Moore, Treston)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Treston E Moore on behalf of Defendant Roger Minkoff (Moore, Treston)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Gigacrete, Inc.c/o Andrew Dennis, Registered Agent (KAB)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for extension of time to answer by Phillip Smith. (Miller, George)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Miller on behalf of Defendant Phillip Smith (Miller, George)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Batten. Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Batten. Phillip Smith served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Batten. Roger Minkoff served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons issued (KAB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Roger Minkoff. (KAB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC. (KAB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Phillip Smith. (KAB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gigacrete, Inc.. (KAB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Tyler Batten against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-742578.)filed by Tyler Batten. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Gigacrete Caribbean LLC, #2 Summons-Gigacrete Inc, #3 Summons-Phillip Smith, #4 Summons-Roger Minkoff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler Batten v. Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigacrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigacrete Caribbean, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Smith
Represented By: George M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Minkoff
Represented By: Treston E Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Batten
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?