Southland Gaming of the VI v. Government of The Virgin Islands et al
Plaintiff: Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc
Defendant: Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor and Government of The United States Virgin Islands
Intervenor: VIGL Operations, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00107
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition to Motion re #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Plaintiff Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Kroblin, Christopher)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor VIGL Operations, LLC. (Plaskett, Miles)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor VIGL Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Plaskett, Miles)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service c/o Attorney General) (Kroblin, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service St. Thomas) (Kroblin, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service St. Croix) (Kroblin, Christopher)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Filer was instructed to re-file.Each summons is a separate entry Re: #11 Summons Returned Executed,. (KAB)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to file Response to Complaint by Government of The United States Virgin Islands, Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor. (Smith-Francois, Ariel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. Government of The United States Virgin Islands served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Kroblin, Christopher)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service St. Croix, #2 Affidavit of Service c/o Attorney General, #3 Affidavit of Service St. Thomas) (Kroblin, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CVG) dated 1/14/19granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and that Jason C. Hicks, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when he is next in this jurisdiction. (CAB)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (CVG) dated 1/14/19granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and that Mark Poovey, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when he is next in this jurisdiction. (CAB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jason Hicks(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-765927) by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DC CoG), #2 Exhibit B (Virginia CoG)) (Whalen, Marjorie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Jason Hicks(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-765927) by Plaintiff Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit Questionnaire, #3 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Whalen, Marjorie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Mark Poovey(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-765912) by Plaintiff Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit Questionnaire, #3 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Whalen, Marjorie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Government of The United States Virgin Islands. (KAB)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor. c/o Joseph Ponteen, Acting Attorney General (KAB)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor. (KAB)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-762037.)filed by Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (Kroblin, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southland Gaming of the VI v. Government of The Virgin Islands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southland Gaming of the Virgin Islands, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Jason C. Hicks
Represented By: Marjorie B Whalen
Represented By: Mark Nixon Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Mapp, Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of The United States Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: VIGL Operations, LLC
Represented By: Miles L. Plaskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?