Bailey v. Lucht
Plaintiff: Ms. Cheryl T Bailey
Defendant: Michal R. Lucht
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Wilma A Lewis
Referring Judge: Wilma A Lewis
2 Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Michal R. Lucht. (Duensing, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Duensing on behalf of Defendant Michal R. Lucht (Duensing, Matthew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michal R. Lucht (Duensing, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michal R. Lucht. (KAB)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michal R. Lucht d/b/a Villallure( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-809478.)filed by Cheryl T Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan) Modified on 9/17/2019 (KAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Lucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Cheryl T Bailey
Represented By: Ryan W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michal R. Lucht
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?