Joseph v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA
Plaintiff: Natasha Joseph
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia and Ascendancy,USVI, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00087
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ascendancy,USVI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ascendancy,USVI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Clive Claudius Rivers on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Joseph (Rivers, Clive)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (RM) granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the complaint. Response is due no later than October 25, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Defendant Ascendancy,USVI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Diaz, Malorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING by Ascendancy,USVI, LLC /Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Diaz, Malorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Malorie Diaz on behalf of Defendant Ascendancy,USVI, LLC (Diaz, Malorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Natasha Joseph from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number STT-19-CV-517. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-812756)filed by ,Ascendancy,USVI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Diaz, Malorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Joseph
Represented By: Clive Claudius Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendancy,USVI, LLC
Represented By: Malorie Diaz
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?