Carty v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA et al
Plaintiff: Yvane Carty and Marmion Carty
Defendant: BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA, Ascendancy USVI, LLC and John Doe Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00088
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ascendancy USVI, LLC, BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit jJ, #11 Exhibit K) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ascendancy USVI, LLC, BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Clive Claudius Rivers on behalf of Plaintiffs Marmion Carty, Yvane Carty (Rivers, Clive)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (RM) granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ascendancy USVI, LLC and Bank of Nova Scotia shall respond to the complaint no later than October 25, 2019 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Ascendancy USVI, LLC, BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Diaz, Malorie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Ann Rich on behalf of Defendant BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Ann Rich on behalf of Defendant Ascendancy USVI, LLC (Rich, Carol Ann)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Marmion Carty, Yvane Carty from Superior Court, case number 2019-503. ( Filing fee paid 0391-812837)filed by Bank of Nova Scotia, Ascendancy USVI,LLC, John Doe Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carty v. BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA
Represented By: Malorie Diaz
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendancy USVI, LLC
Represented By: Malorie Diaz
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvane Carty
Represented By: Clive Claudius Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marmion Carty
Represented By: Clive Claudius Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?