Prince v. H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Prince
Defendant: H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot
Case Number: 3:2019cv00093
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
2 Judge: Juan R Sanchez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot (Morgan, Micol)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Production to Defendant by Nehemiah Prince (Greene, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant by Nehemiah Prince (Greene, Ryan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/22/2019. (KAB)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for February 27, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for July 20, 2020 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 3 before US District Judge Juan R Sanchez. (AO)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendant H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot. (Morgan, Micol)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Nehemiah Prince. (Greene, Ryan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Home Depot by H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot (Morgan, Micol)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Nehemiah Prince (Greene, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (RM) Initial Conference previously set for November 22,2019 at 9:30 am is rescheduled for November 22, 2019 at 10:30 am in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TRH)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morgan, Micol)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE (WAL) dated 10/24/2019. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Juan R. Sanchez for all further proceedings. District Judge Curtis V. Gomez is no longer assigned to this case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TLS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot. (Morgan, Micol)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-19-cv-000495. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-814803)filed by H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint) (Morgan, Micol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Prince
Represented By: Ryan W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D.V.I. Holding Company d/b/a The Home Depot
Represented By: Micol L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?