St. Rose et al v. Heavy Materials LLC et al
Plaintiff: Monrose Loctar, John St. Rose and Derrick James
Defendant: Heavy Materials LLC, Warren Mosler and Spartan Concrete Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Agreed Extension to Respond to Complaint by Heavy Materials LLC (Manning, Yohana)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Benjamin Goodman(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-839196) by Defendant Heavy Materials LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Manning, Yohana)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Ronald Breaux(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-839190) by Defendant Heavy Materials LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Manning, Yohana)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Yohana M Manning on behalf of Defendant Heavy Materials LLC (Manning, Yohana)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John St. Rose. Heavy Materials LLC served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Nelson, Korey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Heavy Materials LLC. (KAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Warren Mosler. (KAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Spartan Concrete Products, LLC. (KAB)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John St. Rose, Monrose Loctar, and Derrick James, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-827761.)filed by John St. Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Heavy Materials Summons, #3 Exhibit Mosler Summons, #4 Exhibit Spartan Summons) (Nelson, Korey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/20/2019) (KAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Rose et al v. Heavy Materials LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monrose Loctar
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John St. Rose
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick James
Represented By: John-Russell Bart Pate
Represented By: Korey A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Materials LLC
Represented By: Yohana M Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Mosler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Concrete Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?