Stinchfield v. Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association et.al
Plaintiff: Michael Stinchfield
Defendant: Barry Duncan, Dennis R. Vaughn, DEBRA HADE, MATTEO SIANO, GAVIN LAYNE FINLEY, Charles T. Angell, DIANA LYNN FINLEY, MARK DALLAS, CIMMARON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., TERRYHILL ENTERPRISES V, L.L.C., Nancy E. Anderson, as Trustee of the Anderson USVI Revocable Trust, Diane T. Vaughn, Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association, RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014, LINDA SIANO, JOEL E. HADE and Allison B. Raines,LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00004
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chanco, Douglas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Blake Chanco on behalf of Defendant Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association (Chanco, Douglas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead by Defendants RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014, MATTEO SIANO, LINDA SIANO. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Chanco, Douglas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead by Defendant MARK DALLAS. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Chanco, Douglas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Blake Chanco on behalf of Defendant MARK DALLAS (Chanco, Douglas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Blake Chanco on behalf of Defendants RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014, MATTEO SIANO, LINDA SIANO (Chanco, Douglas)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Allison B. Raines,LLC. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to LINDA SIANO. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to GAVIN LAYNE FINLEY. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to MARK DALLAS. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to CIMMARON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to DIANA LYNN FINLEY. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to DEBRA HADE. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Dennis R. Vaughn. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MATTEO SIANO. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Diane T. Vaughn. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Barry Duncan. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy E. Anderson, as Trustee of the Anderson USVI Revocable Trust. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles T. Angell. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TERRYHILL ENTERPRISES V, L.L.C.. (KAB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOEL E. HADE. (KAB)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury against Charles T. Angell, CIMMARON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., MARK DALLAS, Barry Duncan, GAVIN LAYNE FINLEY, DIANA LYNN FINLEY, DEBRA HADE, JOEL E. HADE, Nancy E. Anderson, as Trustee of the Anderson USVI Revocable Trust, RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014, MATTEO SIANO, LINDA SIANO, TERRYHILL ENTERPRISES V, L.L.C., Dennis R. Vaughn, Diane T. Vaughn, Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-831200.)filed by Michael Stinchfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons - Barry Duncan, #3 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #4 Exhibit Virgin Grand Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association, #5 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons - Charles T. Angell, #7 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #8 Exhibit Summons - Nancy E. Anderson, as Trustee of The Nancy E. Anderson USVI Revocable Trust, #9 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #10 Exhibit Summons - Dennis R. Vaughn, #11 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #12 Exhibit Summons - Diane T. Vaughn, #13 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #14 Exhibit Summons - Joel E. Hade, #15 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #16 Exhibit Summons - Debra Hade, #17 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #18 Exhibit Summons - Terryhill Enterprises V, L.L.C., #19 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #20 Exhibit Summons - Matteo Siano, #21 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #22 Exhibit Summons- Linda Siano, #23 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #24 Exhibit Summons - Richard Anthony Cardoza II, as Trustee of The Richard Anthony Cardoza Trust, a/u/d March 1, 2014, #25 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #26 Exhibit Summons - Mark Dallas, #27 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #28 Exhibit Summons - Gavin Layne Finley, #29 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #30 Exhibit Summons - Diana Lynn Finley, #31 Exhibit Addendum to Summons, #32 Exhibit Summons - Cimmaron Property Management, Inc., #33 Exhibit Addendum to Summons) (Friedberg, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinchfield v. Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association et.al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis R. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA HADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTEO SIANO
Represented By: Douglas Blake Chanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAVIN LAYNE FINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANA LYNN FINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DALLAS
Represented By: Douglas Blake Chanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIMMARON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRYHILL ENTERPRISES V, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. Anderson, as Trustee of the Anderson USVI Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane T. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Islands Estates #60 Villa Association, aka Virgin Grand Estates No. 60 Homeowners Association
Represented By: Douglas Blake Chanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA II, TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD ANTHONY CARDOZA TRUST, a/u/d MARCH 1, 2014
Represented By: Douglas Blake Chanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA SIANO
Represented By: Douglas Blake Chanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL E. HADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison B. Raines,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stinchfield
Represented By: Thomas F. Friedberg
Represented By: Thomas Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?