LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00019
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Curtis V Gomez
Referring Judge: Ruth Miller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION. (Erwin, Joseph)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION. GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. (Erwin, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with corrected signature against LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATIONfiled by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erwin, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS/ Honorable Albert Bryan,Jr. Governor. (KAB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS/ Joel A. Lee,Director Virgin Islands Bureau of Internal Revenue. (KAB)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY E-signature is needed Re: #4 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #3 Notice (Other). (KAB)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE request for issuance of summons by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Governor, #2 Summons - VIBIR) (Erwin, Joseph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE filing of Civil Cover Sheet by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Erwin, Joseph)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Civil Cover Sheet is needed.Please file.Re: #1 Complaint,. (KAB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Refund of Income Tax against GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-843514.)filed by LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex B - Form 8288, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Claim for Refund) (Erwin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LBL LIFE SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph M. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?