Williams v. People of the Virgin Islands
Petitioner: Jermaine A. Williams
Respondent: PEOPLE OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00049
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:20-cv-00367. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TRH)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to USDC for the District of the Virgin Islands. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 7/7/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 7/8/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine A. Williams. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 7/8/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Jermaine A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachments with Exhibits-(missing page 22), #2 Report and Recommendation and Order)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 7/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. People of the Virgin Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jermaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PEOPLE OF THE VIRGIN ISLANDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?