United Corporation v USVI
Plaintiff: UNITED CORPORATION
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS
Case Number: 3:2021cv00043
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (RM) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to July 6, 2021 to File a Response to the complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by Defendant THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Smith-Francois, Ariel)
June 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel Marie Smith-Francois on behalf of Defendant THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS (Smith-Francois, Ariel)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Governor) (Sheesley, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED CORPORATION. THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service AG Office) (Sheesley, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons. (EMK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The United States Virgin Islands. (EMK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Sheesley on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED CORPORATION (Sheesley, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-934047.)filed by UNITED CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit ex 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 part 2, #5 Exhibit ex 3 part 1, #6 Exhibit ex 3 part 2, #7 Exhibit ex 4 part 1, #8 Exhibit ex 4 part 2, #9 Exhibit ex 5 part 1, #10 Exhibit ex 5 part 2, #11 Exhibit ex 6 part 1, #12 Exhibit ex part 2, #13 Exhibit ex 7 part 1, #14 Exhibit ex 7 part 2, #15 Exhibit ex 8 part 1, #16 Exhibit ex 8 part 2, #17 Exhibit ex 9, #18 Exhibit ex 10 part 1, #19 Exhibit ex 10 part 2, #20 Exhibit ex 11 part 1, #21 Exhibit ex 11 part 2, #22 Exhibit ex 11 part 3, #23 Exhibit ex 12, #24 Exhibit ex 13 part 1, #25 Exhibit ex 13 part 2, #26 Exhibit ex 13 part 3, #27 Exhibit ex 14 part 1, #28 Exhibit ex 14 part 2, #29 Exhibit ex 15 part 1, #30 Exhibit ex 15 part 2, #31 Exhibit ex 16 part 1, #32 Exhibit ex 16 part 2, #33 Exhibit ex 16 part 3, #34 Exhibit ex 17 part 1, #35 Exhibit ex 17 part 2, #36 Exhibit ex 17 part 3, #37 Exhibit ex 18 part 1, #38 Exhibit ex 18 part 2, #39 Exhibit ex 19, #40 Exhibit ex 20, #41 Exhibit ex 21, #42 Exhibit ex 22 part 1, #43 Exhibit ex 22 part 2, #44 Exhibit ex 23, #45 Exhibit ex 24, #46 Exhibit ex 25 part 1, #47 Exhibit ex 25 part 2, #48 Exhibit ex 25 part 3, #49 Exhibit ex 26, #50 Exhibit ex 27, #51 Exhibit ex 28 part 1, #52 Exhibit ex 28 part 2, #53 Exhibit ex 29 part 1, #54 Exhibit ex 29 part 2, #55 Exhibit ex 30, #56 Exhibit ex 31, #57 Exhibit ex 32, #58 Civil Cover Sheet, #59 proposed summons) (DiRuzzo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Corporation v USVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES VIRGIN ISLANDS
Represented By: Ariel Marie Smith-Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph A DiRuzzo, III
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?