SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 et al
Plaintiff: SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC
Defendant: CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL, MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 and Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 24 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VITEMA) (Sheesley, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 23 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIPD) (Sheesley, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 22 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS) (Sheesley, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS (Gladys Cafe)) (Sheesley, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS (Gladys Cafe)) (Sheesley, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (RM) granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED's answer due 9/1/2021; CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL's answer due 9/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Mast, Gregory)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Defendants CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL (Mast, Gregory)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena - VITEMA, #2 Exhibit Subpoena - VIFS, #3 Exhibit Subpoena - VIFS (Gladys), #4 Exhibit Subpoena - VIPD, #5 Exhibit Subpoena - VIDLCA (Gladys), #6 Exhibit Subpoena - ESI Houston) (Sheesley, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 (Mast, Gregory)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM) granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the complaint. Defendant shall have until August 26, 2021 to file its response. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Golden, John)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Golden on behalf of Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 (Golden, John)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC. MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service_Marshall & Sterling St. Thomas) (Sheesley, Michael)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service_LLoyd's) (Sheesley, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Re: Extension of Time by MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kuczynski, Robert)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendant MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY (Kuczynski, Robert)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued to plaintiff(s) Michael Sheesley with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (W, K)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL. (W, K)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED. (W, K)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY. (W, K)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd.. (W, K)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19. (W, K)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19, CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL, MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY, Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942616.)filed by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - news article, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons - Lloyd's, #5 Summons - Thompson, #6 Summons - Marshall, #7 Summons - Charles Taylor, #8 Summons - Gambol) (Sheesley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY
Represented By: Robert J. Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Represented By: John Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?