Russ v. S/V Wind of Change
Plaintiff: Richard Russ
Defendant: S/V Wind of Change
Case Number: 3:2021cv00079
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (RM) granting #10 Motion for Refund of Duplicate Payment. (AO)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Plaintiff Richard Russ. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Payment Confirmations, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposted Order) (Sheesley, Michael)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Richard Russ (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sheesley, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #1 Complaint Civil Cover sheet is required in accordance with LCRi 3.1. Counsel is required to file a Notice of Filing with the Civil Cover Sheet as the attachment. (EMK)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM): #6 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian is denied without prejudice. (AO)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (substitute) by Plaintiff Richard Russ. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Russ, #2 Exhibit Hold Harmless Agreement, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Sheesley, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 WARRANT for Maritime Arrest issued against defendant S/V WIND OF CHANGE, Official No. FR-CATBB011T516, her engines, masts, anchors, cables, chains, rigging, tackle, apparel, and furnishings in rem. (EMK)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (RM) dated 11/2/2021that the Clerk of Court shall issue a warrant for maritime arrest of the S/V Wind of Change (Official No. FR-catbbo11T516). re: 3 Motion. (EMK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case Until Execution of Warrant of Arrest by Plaintiff Richard Russ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sheesley, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against S/V Wind of Change ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-965746.)filed by Richard Russ. (Sheesley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russ v. S/V Wind of Change
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Russ
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S/V Wind of Change
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?