Gurlea et al v. Dudley et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Gurlea, Thomas Brunt IV and Shane Brunt
Defendant: George H.T. Dudley and Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00024
Filed: April 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Negotiated Extension of Time pursuant to LRCi 6.1(b)(7) by Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV, Douglas Gurlea re #22 Memorandum in Support to Motion, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Sheesley, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants George H.T. Dudley, Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (Morgenstern, John)
June 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants George H.T. Dudley, Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morgenstern, John)
May 23, 2022 Filing 20 OATH OF ADMISSION of Tracey Keij-Denton, Esquire Related Document: #17 (CAB)
May 23, 2022 Filing 19 OATH OF ADMISSION of Omid Zareh, Esquire Related Document: #17 (CAB)
May 23, 2022 Filing 18 OATH OF ADMISSION of John Morgenstern, Esquire Related Document: #17 (CAB)
May 23, 2022 Filing 17 Minute Entry for Oath of Admission of John Morgenstern, Omid Zareh, and Tracey Keij-Denton to the bar of the District Court held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: via TEAMS held on 5/23/2022. (KW)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission for John P. Morgenstern, Esq., Tracey Keij-Denton, Esq., and Omid Zareh, Esq., shall be administered on May 23, 2022 at 9:30 AM via Microsoft Teams before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Microsoft Teams information will be provided to counsel via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM) dated 5/16/2022 that #13 John P. Morgenstern, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM) dated 5/16/2022 that #12 Tracey Keij-Denton, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and she shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
May 16, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: John P. Morgenstern(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1003791) by Defendants George H.T. Dudley, Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Tracey Keij-Denton(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1001619) by Plaintiffs Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV, Douglas Gurlea. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing - NY, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Tracey Keij-Denton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of MLS, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Sheesley, Michael)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (RM) dated 4/27/2022 that #10 Omid Zareh, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Omid Zareh(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-998817) by Plaintiffs Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV, Douglas Gurlea. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pro hac vice application, #2 Exhibit NY certificate of good standing, #3 Exhibit Zareh declaration, #4 Exhibit Sheesley declaration, #5 Exhibit proposed order) (Sheesley, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Gurlea, Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV. George H.T. Dudley served on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Georgee H.T. Dudley) (Sheesley, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Gurlea, Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV. Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP served on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - DNF LLP) (Sheesley, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (RM) granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint. Defendants' responses are due by June 1, 2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants George H.T. Dudley, Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Daryl Dodson on behalf of Defendants George H.T. Dudley, Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP (Dodson, J. Daryl)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (TNS)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to George H.T. Dudley. (TNS)
April 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-995241.)filed by Shane Brunt, Thomas Brunt IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - George HT Dudley, #3 Summons - DNF LLP) (Sheesley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurlea et al v. Dudley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Gurlea
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Represented By: Omid Zareh
Represented By: Tracey Keij-Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Brunt IV
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Represented By: Omid Zareh
Represented By: Tracey Keij-Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Brunt
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Represented By: Omid Zareh
Represented By: Tracey Keij-Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George H.T. Dudley
Represented By: J. Daryl Dodson
Represented By: John P. Morgenstern
Represented By: John Philip Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP
Represented By: J. Daryl Dodson
Represented By: John P. Morgenstern
Represented By: John Philip Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?