Republican National Committee et al v. Virgin Islands Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee and Republican Party of the Virgin Islands
Defendant: Virgin Islands Board of Elections and Caroline F. Fawkes
Case Number: 3:2022cv00049
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Affidavit) (Capdeville, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 32 OATH OF ADMISSION of Cameron T. Norris, Esquire Related Document: 31 (CAB)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Cameron T. Norris, Esq., previously set for September 16, 2022 is reset for September 22, 2022 at 09:30 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 16, 2022 Filing 30 OATH OF ADMISSION of Frank H. Chang, Esquire Related Document: #28 (CAB)
September 16, 2022 Filing 29 OATH OF ADMISSION of Tyler Green, Esquire Related Document: #27 (CAB)
September 16, 2022 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/16/2022. (TRH)
September 16, 2022 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Oath of Admission Hearing held on 9/16/2022. (TRH)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Cameron T. Norris, Esq., Frank H. Chang, Esq., and Tyler R. Green, Esq., is set for September 16, 2022 at 9:30 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided to counsel by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
September 13, 2022 Filing 25 HARD COPY NOTICE of filing sent to Andrew L. Capdeville, Esq. on behalf of plaintiff Related Document: 24 , #23 (KW)
September 13, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued to plaintiff(s) Republican National Committee et al with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KW)
September 13, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Board of Elections c/o GOVERNOR ALBERT BRYAN, JR. (KW)
September 12, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Capdeville, Andrew)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (RM) dated 9/2/2022 that #18 Cameron T. Norris, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (RM) dated 9/2/2022 that #17 Tyler R. Green, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (RM) dated 9/2/2022 that #16 Frank H. Chang, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 17, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Cameron T. Norris(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1020033) by Plaintiffs Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Tyler R. Green(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1020030) by Plaintiffs Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Frank H. Chang(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1020025) by Plaintiffs Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Verified Complaint; Exhibit A; Clerk's Notice Regarding Consent to Reference a Civil Action or Proceeding to a Magistrate Judge; and Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Melva Smith, Election Assistant on 08/12/2022, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Caroline F. Fawkes served on 8/12/2022, answer due 9/2/2022. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Verified Complaint; Exhibit A; Clerk's Notice Regarding Consent to Reference of Civil Action or Proceeding to a Magistrate; and Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Darneal F. Milliner of Virgin Islands Department of Justice on 08/12/2022, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Virgin Islands Board of Elections served on 8/12/2022, answer due 9/2/2022. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Verified Complaint; Exhibit A; Clerk's Notice Regarding Consent to Reference of Civil Actionor Proceeding to a Magistrate Judge; and Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on S. Richardson, Election Assistant on 08/11/2022, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. Virgin Islands Board of Elections served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 8, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each Summons. (JC)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Board of Elections C/O Denise George, Esq. (JC)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each Summons. (JC)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Caroline F. Fawkes. (JC)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each Summons. (JC)
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Board of Elections. (JC)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republican National Committee. (Capdeville, Andrew)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caroline F. Fawkes, Virgin Islands Board of Elections ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1017729.)filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party of the Virgin Islands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Capdeville, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republican National Committee et al v. Virgin Islands Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Andrew L. Capdeville
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Frank H Chang
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican Party of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Andrew L. Capdeville
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Frank H Chang
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Islands Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline F. Fawkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?