Stephenson et al v. Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club et al
Plaintiff: John Stephenson and Wendy Lea
Defendant: Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club, Akiba Pickering, M/V Salty Hooker, its engines, tackle and equipment, Lovango Island Holdings, LLP doing business as Lovango Resort & Beach Club and M/V Salty Hooker
Case Number: 3:2023cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 12 Opposition to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Lea, John Stephenson. (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Lovango Island Holdings, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Thomas, Chivonne)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Wendy Lea, John Stephenson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
January 20, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #9 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to LRCi 5.2(a) Jennifer Miller Brooks, Esq. is required to file a Notice of Appearance. (IW)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chivonne Thomas on behalf of Defendant Lovango Island Holdings, LLP (Thomas, Chivonne)
January 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Filing Negotiated Extension to Respond to Complaint by Lovango Island Holdings, LLP (Thomas, Chivonne)
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stephenson, Wendy Lea. M/V Salty Hooker served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Service on Salty Hooker) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stephenson, Wendy Lea. Lovango Island Holdings, LLP served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Service on Lovango Island Holdings LLP) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stephenson, Wendy Lea. Akiba Pickering served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Service on Akiba Pickering) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M/V Salty Hooker. (IW)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Akiba Pickering. (IW)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club. (IW)
January 5, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons. Re: #2 , #3 , #4 . (IW)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1042906.)filed by John Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club, #2 Exhibit Summons - Akiba Pickering, #3 Exhibit Summons - M/V Salty Hooker, its engins, tackle and equipment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson et al v. Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephenson
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Lea
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovango Island Holdings, LLP d/b/a Lovango Resort & Beach Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiba Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Salty Hooker, its engines, tackle and equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovango Island Holdings, LLP doing business as Lovango Resort & Beach Club
Represented By: Chivonne Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Salty Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?