Manker v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bernice Manker
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00582
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 So Ordered re #26 Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by Bernice Manker. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/31/2015. (rban, )
December 30, 2015 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Bernice Manker. (Martell, Katherine)
December 28, 2015 Filing 25 Objection to #21 Exhibit List and Witness List filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Morell, Rafael)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 So Ordered re: #23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc filed by Bernice Manker. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/18/15. (pmil, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc by Bernice Manker. (Martell, Katherine)
December 17, 2015 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2015. Appearances of counsel. Parties have filed & exchanged exhibits/witness lists. Trial estimate 1-2 days. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2016 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
December 17, 2015 Filing 21 Witness and Exhibit List by Bernice Manker.. (Martell, Katherine)
December 16, 2015 Filing 20 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Exhibit List by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc... (Morell, Rafael)
December 10, 2015 Filing 19 Withdrawal of Motion by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. re #15 MOTION for Protective Order (Morell, Rafael)
December 9, 2015 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bernice Manker. (Martell, Katherine)
December 7, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #15 MOTION for Protective Order (clar, )
December 7, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
December 4, 2015 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date re #15 MOTION for Protective Order (Morell, Rafael)
December 4, 2015 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Morell, Rafael)
December 4, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morell, Rafael)
December 1, 2015 Filing 14 A settlement conference was held in Manker v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., et al. (15-cv-582) on Tuesday, December 1, 2015. All parties were present. The conference lasted from 10:30AM-12:30PM (2 hours). The parties did not settle. (jwil, ) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/1/2015) (jwil, ).
November 19, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2015 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jwil, )
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because the parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan #12 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for 8/19/2015 is cancelled. Upon representations made by the parties in their Rule 26(f) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties Rule 26(f) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/19/2015. (rban, )
August 18, 2015 Initial Pretrial Conference Terminated. (jwil, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 12 Joint Discovery Plan by Bernice Manker.(Martell, Katherine)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 12/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/30/15. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
July 27, 2015 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Morell, Rafael)
July 27, 2015 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
July 27, 2015 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Morell, Rafael)
July 27, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
July 1, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Martell on behalf of Bernice Manker (Martell, Katherine)
June 29, 2015 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. waiver sent on 5/28/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (nhall )
May 11, 2015 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bernice Manker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination 9/9/11, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue 9/30/11, #3 Exhibit Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination 8/17/12, #5 Exhibit Right to Sue 2/5/15)(Ralls, Meredith)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that within 14 days plaintiff show cause as to why this complaint should not be dismissed for failure to establish the basis for jurisdiction, as required under Fed.R.Civ.P. 8(a)(1). (See Order For Details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/11/15. (nhall )
May 5, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued and given for service by SPS as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (nhall )
May 5, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683051196.), filed by Bernice Manker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(nhall )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manker v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Eloy Morell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Eloy Morell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Manker
Represented By: Meredith Madden Ralls
Represented By: Katherine Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?