Davison v. Loudoun County Board of Supervisors et al

Plaintiff: Brian C. Davison
Defendant: Loudoun County Board of Supervisors, Leo Rogers, Phyllis Randall, Tony Buffington, Ron Meyer and Geary Higgins
Case Number: 1:2016cv00932
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Loudoun
Presiding Judge: James C. Cacheris
Presiding Judge: Ivan D. Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 07/25/2017. (mpha)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 05/10/2017. (mpha)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 01/04/2017. (mpha) (Main Document 57 replaced on 1/5/2017 - motions number fixed)(mpha)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defts' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 3]. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 09/14/16. (pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davison v. Loudoun County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loudoun County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Rogers
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Randall
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Buffington
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Meyer
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geary Higgins
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?