Chien v. Grogan et al
Plaintiff: Chien and Andrew Chien
Defendant: Grogan, William K Grogan and William K Grogan & Associates
Case Number: 1:2016cv01470
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James C Cacheris
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Filing 21 Memorandum to Further Verify the Nature of #17 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that (1) Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Reconsideration and for an Extension of Time is DENIED. (2) The Court adopts the conclusions and findings set forth in Judge Nachmanoff's Report & Recommendations [Dkt. 16]. (3) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for improper service of process under Rule 4 ----- THIS ORDER IS FINAL (see order for details). Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 3/23/17. (klau, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 3/23/17. (klau, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration of Dismiss and Permission for Enlarge Time Till April 20, 2017 to Make Personal Service by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
March 3, 2017 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Andrew Chien. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/2/2017. (rban, )
March 1, 2017 Per MSN chambers motions set for 3/3/17 on the pleadings (clar, )
February 28, 2017 Filing 15 Supplementary Memorandum of Law and Fact in Support re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Andrew Chien. (Attachments: #1 attachment -Judicial Notice (II), #2 Proposed Order)(klau, )
February 21, 2017 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION filed by Andrew Chien (dest, )
February 16, 2017 Filing 13 Letter to pro se plaintiff regarding Local Civil Rule 83.1 mailed to pro se plaintiff re: dkt. no. #10 , #11 & #12 . (klau, )
February 16, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #10 MOTION for Default Judgment (klau, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Default Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Andrew Chien. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 attachment, #3 attachment)(klau, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as premature #7 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff is advised to serve Defendants within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint, in accordance with the rules, or face possible dismissal of the lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/19/2017. (rban, )
January 18, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Default Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
January 18, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #7 MOTION for Default Judgment (klau, )
January 9, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment by Andrew Chien. (told to notice) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(klau, )
December 28, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service by Andrew Chien (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlan)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that #3 Motion Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing is GRANTED in part to allow Plaintiff to receive electronically documents filed in this case. Pursuant to the Court's rules for pro se litigants, Plaintiff shall not be permitted to file documents electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/2/16. Copy mailed: yes (klau, )
December 2, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William K Grogan, William K Grogan & Associates. copies mailed to pro se plaintiff for service (gwalk, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 2 Plaintiff Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Andrew Chien. (klau, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against William K Grogan, William K Grogan & Associates ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683062907.), filed by Andrew Chien. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Receipt)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chien v. Grogan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K Grogan & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?